THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:29:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Health Sciences Centre – Kingston General Hospital
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Health Sciences Centre - Hotel Dieu Hospital
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 23 Jan 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 23 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Quirt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Quirt (CPSO#: 113073 )
Business Address: 814 Johnson Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2B5
647-970-5489

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Health Sciences Centre – Kingston General Hospital
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Health Sciences Centre - Hotel Dieu Hospital
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 23 Jan 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 23 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Quirt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Quirt (CPSO#: 113073 )
Business Address: 814 Johnson Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2B5
647-970-5489

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Jan 2025
24 Jan 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 25 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jan 24 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JILL SUTHERLAND QUIRT may practise general surgery at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Kingston Health Sciences Centre – Kingston General Hospital; and

(ii) Kingston Health Sciences Centre - Hotel Dieu Hospital.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. QUIRT’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. QUIRT’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. QUIRT’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 25 January, 2025, and will expire on or before 24 January, 2028, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JILL SUTHERLAND QUIRT may practise general surgery at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Kingston Health Sciences Centre – Kingston General Hospital; and

(ii) Kingston Health Sciences Centre - Hotel Dieu Hospital.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. QUIRT’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. QUIRT’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. QUIRT’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 25 January, 2025, and will expire on or before 24 January, 2028, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 24 Jan 2028

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017