THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:03:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 211-9401 Jane St
Boomerang Health
Suite 211
Maple ON L6A 4H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055533155
Fax: 9055538120
Address: 20 Lynch St
Peel Memorial Hospital
Pediatrics
Brampton ON L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 22552
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench Street
Mackenzie Richmond Hill
Pediatrics
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Extension: 5490
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Centenary Hospital
Galaxy 12 Child and Teen Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 4162817476
Fax: 4162817313
Address: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Endocrinology
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-6217
Fax: 416-813-6304
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Child and Youth Centre
G2
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Phone: 416-469-6590
Fax: 416-469-6591

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samantha Gerber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gerber (CPSO#: 113076 )
Business Address: 211-9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Address: 170 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E8
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 211-9401 Jane St
Boomerang Health
Suite 211
Maple ON L6A 4H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055533155
Fax: 9055538120
Address: 20 Lynch St
Peel Memorial Hospital
Pediatrics
Brampton ON L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 22552
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench Street
Mackenzie Richmond Hill
Pediatrics
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Extension: 5490
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Centenary Hospital
Galaxy 12 Child and Teen Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 4162817476
Fax: 4162817313
Address: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Endocrinology
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-6217
Fax: 416-813-6304
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Child and Youth Centre
G2
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Phone: 416-469-6590
Fax: 416-469-6591

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samantha Gerber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gerber (CPSO#: 113076 )
Business Address: 211-9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Address: 170 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E8
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA GILLIAN GERBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERBER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA GILLIAN GERBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERBER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017