THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:26:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
249 Ontario Street
Port Hope Ontario L1A3Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)885-5770
Fax: (905)885-2568

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cornish and Whyte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cornish (CPSO#: 106653 ) Dr. H. Whyte (CPSO#: 113122 )
Business Address: 249 Ontario St
Suite 204
Port Hope ON L1A 2v9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
249 Ontario Street
Port Hope Ontario L1A3Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)885-5770
Fax: (905)885-2568

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cornish and Whyte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cornish (CPSO#: 106653 ) Dr. H. Whyte (CPSO#: 113122 )
Business Address: 249 Ontario St
Suite 204
Port Hope ON L1A 2v9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENA SYLVIA WHYTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHYTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENA SYLVIA WHYTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHYTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017