THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 09:22:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 256-9370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHARLOTTE DAWSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dawson (CPSO#: 113163 )
Business Address: 95 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
613-256-9370
Business Address: 75 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
613-256-2500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 256-9370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHARLOTTE DAWSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dawson (CPSO#: 113163 )
Business Address: 95 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
613-256-9370
Business Address: 75 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
613-256-2500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE MARIE DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE MARIE DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017