THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:56:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology, Glaucoma Service
6th Floor, East Wing/Fell Pavilion, Technical Services
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416-603-5800
Extension: 5302
Fax: 416-603-5334, [email protected]
Address: 501-340 College St
Kensington Vision and Research Centre
Ophthalmology
Suite 501
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: 416-928-1335
Fax: 416-928-5075

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Feb 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mathew (CPSO#: 113167 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
EW 6-405
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology, Glaucoma Service
6th Floor, East Wing/Fell Pavilion, Technical Services
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416-603-5800
Extension: 5302
Fax: 416-603-5334, [email protected]
Address: 501-340 College St
Kensington Vision and Research Centre
Ophthalmology
Suite 501
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: 416-928-1335
Fax: 416-928-5075

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Feb 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mathew (CPSO#: 113167 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
EW 6-405
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Feb 2021
11 Feb 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 12 2021
EXPIRY DATE: Feb 11 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DAVID JOSE MATHEW may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalomology and Vision Sciences, University of Toronto, in which Dr. MATHEW holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MATHEW no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MATHEW’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MATHEW’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 12 February, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 11 February, 2028.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DAVID JOSE MATHEW may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalomology and Vision Sciences, University of Toronto, in which Dr. MATHEW holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MATHEW no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MATHEW’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MATHEW’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 12 February, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 11 February, 2028.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 11 Feb 2028

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017