THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:05:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1950 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 206
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-472-1030
Fax: 705-472-4466
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 75657
Fax: 519-685-8595
Address: 1950 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 206
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Z2
Phone: 705-472-1030
Fax: 705-472-4466
Address: 685 Bloem Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Z5
Phone: 705-475-0500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PAINTER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Painter (CPSO#: 113204 ) Dr. C. Collins (CPSO#: 109545 )
Business Address: 720 Wallace Rd
North Bay ON P1A 0G8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1950 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 206
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-472-1030
Fax: 705-472-4466
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 75657
Fax: 519-685-8595
Address: 1950 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 206
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Z2
Phone: 705-472-1030
Fax: 705-472-4466
Address: 685 Bloem Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Z5
Phone: 705-475-0500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PAINTER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Painter (CPSO#: 113204 ) Dr. C. Collins (CPSO#: 109545 )
Business Address: 720 Wallace Rd
North Bay ON P1A 0G8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD WILLIAM PAINTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAINTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD WILLIAM PAINTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAINTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017