THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:30:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 672 Elias Street
London Ontario N5W 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132661672
Fax: 8889815030
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: 6132661672
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. BLIER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Blier (CPSO#: 113205 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 672 Elias Street
London Ontario N5W 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132661672
Fax: 8889815030
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: 6132661672
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. BLIER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Blier (CPSO#: 113205 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC-ANDRE BLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC-ANDRE BLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 May 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 May 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017