THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:40:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ross Memorial Hospital
Intensive Care Unit/UCC
10 Angeline St N
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Lakeridge Health Bowmanwille
Critical Care
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Phone: 9056233331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Phone: 9053726811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Critical Care
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Neil Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Patel (CPSO#: 113229 )
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
Intensive Care Unit/UCC
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ross Memorial Hospital
Intensive Care Unit/UCC
10 Angeline St N
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Lakeridge Health Bowmanwille
Critical Care
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Phone: 9056233331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Phone: 9053726811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Critical Care
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Neil Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Patel (CPSO#: 113229 )
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
Intensive Care Unit/UCC
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Feb 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 15 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Neil Patel may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Neil Patel may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2017