THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:35:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Palliative Care
9N9
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. C. Maybee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maybee (CPSO#: 113350 )
Business Address: 3 Robert Speck Pky
Suite #900
Mississauga ON L4Z 2G5
9052760431

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Palliative Care
9N9
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. C. Maybee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maybee (CPSO#: 113350 )
Business Address: 3 Robert Speck Pky
Suite #900
Mississauga ON L4Z 2G5
9052760431

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABBY CATHERINE MAYBEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYBEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABBY CATHERINE MAYBEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYBEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017