THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 18:04:47 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Health Sciences Centre - Hotel Dieu Site
Johnson 1, Room J1-014
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-544-3400
Extension: 2250
Fax: 613-544-7250
Address: 460 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1C2
Phone: (613) 544-3242
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 24 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. N. D. SANTI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Santi (CPSO#: 113364 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
J1-014
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
613-544-3400 Extn: 2250
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
ARMSTRONG 3
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
613-549-6666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Health Sciences Centre - Hotel Dieu Site
Johnson 1, Room J1-014
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-544-3400
Extension: 2250
Fax: 613-544-7250
Address: 460 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1C2
Phone: (613) 544-3242
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 24 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. N. D. SANTI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Santi (CPSO#: 113364 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
J1-014
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
613-544-3400 Extn: 2250
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
ARMSTRONG 3
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
613-549-6666

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLAS DESMARAIS SANTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLAS DESMARAIS SANTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017