THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:39:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2458 Boulevard du Curé-Labelle
Laval Québec H7T 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (450) 314-8759
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records from 22B-550 Terminal Ave Ottawa, ON KlG 0Z3 are
stored at Records Management Ltd.

Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can
contact Records Management Ltd.

Telephone: 1-800-775-0093 Website:
Michel
Date Received: 20 Jun 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maalouf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maalouf (CPSO#: 113367 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Address: 1899 Ferncroft Crescent
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7B4
6136141699

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2458 Boulevard du Curé-Labelle
Laval Québec H7T 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (450) 314-8759
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records from 22B-550 Terminal Ave Ottawa, ON KlG 0Z3 are
stored at Records Management Ltd.

Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can
contact Records Management Ltd.

Telephone: 1-800-775-0093 Website:
Michel
Date Received: 20 Jun 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maalouf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maalouf (CPSO#: 113367 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Address: 1899 Ferncroft Crescent
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7B4
6136141699

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHEL MAALOUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAALOUF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHEL MAALOUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAALOUF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017