THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:38:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universite De Nantes, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 May 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Noëmie Praud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Praud (CPSO#: 113373 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Universite De Nantes, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 May 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Noëmie Praud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Praud (CPSO#: 113373 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Mar 2024
12 May 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 13 2024
EXPIRY DATE: May 12 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Noemie Celine Isabelle Praud may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry and Behavioural Neurosciences, Division of Emergency
Services, McMaster University, in which Dr. Praud holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Praud no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Praud's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Praud's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on May 13, 2020. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on May 12, 2027.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Noemie Celine Isabelle Praud may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry and Behavioural Neurosciences, Division of Emergency
Services, McMaster University, in which Dr. Praud holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Praud no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Praud's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Praud's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on May 13, 2020. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on May 12, 2027.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universite De Nantes, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 12 May 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 May 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 12 May 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 May 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017