THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:32:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Mckenize Health Richmond Hill
Diagnostic Radiology
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Diagnostic Radiology
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9054172000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Diagnostic Radiology
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EMMAD QAZI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Qazi (CPSO#: 113377 )
Business Address: 1440 Lochlin Trail
Mississauga ON L5G 3V3
6479917294

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Mckenize Health Richmond Hill
Diagnostic Radiology
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Diagnostic Radiology
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9054172000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Diagnostic Radiology
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EMMAD QAZI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Qazi (CPSO#: 113377 )
Business Address: 1440 Lochlin Trail
Mississauga ON L5G 3V3
6479917294

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMADUDDIN MUHAMMAD QAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QAZI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMADUDDIN MUHAMMAD QAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QAZI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017