THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:24:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma de San Luis Potosi, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHS McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 72759
Fax: 9055212601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregorio Zuniga Villanueva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Zuniga Villanueva (CPSO#: 113384 )
Business Address: 1200-25 Main St W
HHS McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
Hamilton ON L8P 1H1
9055212100 Extn: 72759

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma de San Luis Potosi, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHS McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 72759
Fax: 9055212601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregorio Zuniga Villanueva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Zuniga Villanueva (CPSO#: 113384 )
Business Address: 1200-25 Main St W
HHS McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
Hamilton ON L8P 1H1
9055212100 Extn: 72759

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Feb 2022
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 25 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Gregorio Zuniga Villanueva may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Division of Palliative Care, McMaster University, in
which Dr. Zuniga Villanueva holds an academic appointment at the
rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Zuniga Villanueva no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Zuniga
Villanueva's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Zuniga Villanueva's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2019, and expires on June 30, 2025.
Upon renewal of Dr. Zuniga Villanueva's academic appointment at McMaster
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Gregorio Zuniga Villanueva may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Division of Palliative Care, McMaster University, in
which Dr. Zuniga Villanueva holds an academic appointment at the
rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Zuniga Villanueva no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Zuniga
Villanueva's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Zuniga Villanueva's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2019, and expires on June 30, 2025.
Upon renewal of Dr. Zuniga Villanueva's academic appointment at McMaster
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Autonoma de San Luis Potosi, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017