THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:21:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Bayview Campus
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashwati Raghunath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raghunath (CPSO#: 113396 )
Business Address: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
FG20
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
4164804089

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Bayview Campus
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashwati Raghunath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raghunath (CPSO#: 113396 )
Business Address: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
FG20
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
4164804089

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHWATI RAGHUNATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGHUNATH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHWATI RAGHUNATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGHUNATH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017