THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:58:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 43000
Fax: 4162421025

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Asadabadi Psychiatry Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asadabadi (CPSO#: 113464 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000 Extn: 43000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 43000
Fax: 4162421025

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Asadabadi Psychiatry Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asadabadi (CPSO#: 113464 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000 Extn: 43000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHTAB ASADABADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASADABADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHTAB ASADABADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASADABADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2017