THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Crimean State Medical University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204A
216 West Steet
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-426-9191
Fax: 519-426-9393

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Svyatoslav Kumanovskiy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kumanovskiy (CPSO#: 113482 )
Business Address: 216 West Street
Suite 204A
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S8
(519) 426-9191

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Crimean State Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204A
216 West Steet
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-426-9191
Fax: 519-426-9393

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Svyatoslav Kumanovskiy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kumanovskiy (CPSO#: 113482 )
Business Address: 216 West Street
Suite 204A
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S8
(519) 426-9191

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Oct 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 17 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Svyatoslav Kumanovskiy may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Svyatoslav Kumanovskiy may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Crimean State Medical University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2017