THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:10:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Samain (CPSO#: 113505 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

Corporation Name: Samain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Samain (CPSO#: 113505 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

Corporation Name: Samain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMI SAMAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMI SAMAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017