THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:32:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel-Dieu Grace Healthcare
Division of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
1453 Prince Rd
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 257-5184
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3719 Walker Rd
Windsor Ontario N8W 3S9
Phone: 519-915-3909
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Div Physical Med & Rehabilitation
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Div Physical Med & Rehabilitation
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 01 Aug 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Seslija Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Seslija (CPSO#: 113530 )
Business Address: 3719 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 3S9
(519) 915-3909
Business Address: Hotel-Dieu Grace Healthcare
Division of Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 253-5111
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: 1030 Oulette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel-Dieu Grace Healthcare
Division of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
1453 Prince Rd
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 257-5184
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3719 Walker Rd
Windsor Ontario N8W 3S9
Phone: 519-915-3909
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Div Physical Med & Rehabilitation
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Div Physical Med & Rehabilitation
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 01 Aug 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Seslija Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Seslija (CPSO#: 113530 )
Business Address: 3719 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 3S9
(519) 915-3909
Business Address: Hotel-Dieu Grace Healthcare
Division of Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 253-5111
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: 1030 Oulette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 May 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 03 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Dana Seslija may practise medicine independently in physical medicine and
rehabilitation.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Dana Seslija may practise medicine independently in physical medicine and
rehabilitation.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017