THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:08:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Department of Psychiatry
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Extension: 2456
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: 5193762121
Extension: 2456
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Nigeria
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. O. Ugwu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ugwu (CPSO#: 113531 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Department of Psychiatry
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Department of Psychiatry
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Extension: 2456
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: 5193762121
Extension: 2456
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Nigeria
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. O. Ugwu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ugwu (CPSO#: 113531 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Department of Psychiatry
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 May 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 03 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nichodemus Ozoemena Ugwu may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nichodemus Ozoemena Ugwu may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2017