THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:28:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-5058
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. S. Sahota Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sahota (CPSO#: 113535 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph & Wolf Lebovic Health Complex
600 University Avenue
Suite 206
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5058

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-5058
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. S. Sahota Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sahota (CPSO#: 113535 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph & Wolf Lebovic Health Complex
600 University Avenue
Suite 206
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5058

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INDERJEET SINGH SAHOTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHOTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INDERJEET SINGH SAHOTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHOTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2017