THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:41:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northwestern University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
1526 - 555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7340
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Aug 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B.A. Sayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sayed (CPSO#: 113630 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
10 Eaton North
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northwestern University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
1526 - 555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7340
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Aug 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B.A. Sayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sayed (CPSO#: 113630 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
10 Eaton North
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Aug 2019
30 Sep 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 01 2019
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Blayne Amir Sayed may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
Division of General and Thoracic Surgery, University of Toronto, in
which Dr. Sayed holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Sayed no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Sayed's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Sayed's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 1, 2019. In accordance with
paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 30, 2026.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Blayne Amir Sayed may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
Division of General and Thoracic Surgery, University of Toronto, in
which Dr. Sayed holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Sayed no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Sayed's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Sayed's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 1, 2019. In accordance with
paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 30, 2026.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northwestern University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Sep 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017