THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:59:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SINDHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +19058452571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: 9056323730
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.AKHTAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Akhtar (CPSO#: 113644 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SINDHI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +19058452571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: 9056323730
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.AKHTAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Akhtar (CPSO#: 113644 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WASEEM AKHTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKHTAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WASEEM AKHTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKHTAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2017