THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:59:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Humber College Blvd
Suite 718
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 740-4113
Fax: (416) 740-4816
Address: 200-4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wang (CPSO#: 113654 )
Business Address: 115 Humber College Blvd
Suite 718
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
(416) 740-4113

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Humber College Blvd
Suite 718
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 740-4113
Fax: (416) 740-4816
Address: 200-4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wang (CPSO#: 113654 )
Business Address: 115 Humber College Blvd
Suite 718
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
(416) 740-4113

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH REN XUAN WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH REN XUAN WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2017