THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:55:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 340 High St
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 797-3230
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 786 Goderich St
Port Elgin Ontario N0H2C3
Phone: (519) 832-9600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Aug 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.R. Bock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bock (CPSO#: 113680 )
Business Address: 5-190 Morpeth St
Southampton ON N0H 2L0
Business Address: 344 McNabb St
Southampton ON N0H 2L0

Corporation Name: G. R. Bock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 340 High St
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 797-3230
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 786 Goderich St
Port Elgin Ontario N0H2C3
Phone: (519) 832-9600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Aug 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.R. Bock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bock (CPSO#: 113680 )
Business Address: 5-190 Morpeth St
Southampton ON N0H 2L0
Business Address: 344 McNabb St
Southampton ON N0H 2L0

Corporation Name: G. R. Bock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAVIN RIBER BOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAVIN RIBER BOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2017