THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:04:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1286 Weston Road
York Ontario M6M 4R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162422850
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Nov 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farah Jetha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jetha (CPSO#: 113681 )
Business Address: 1286 Weston Rd
York ON M6M 4R3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1286 Weston Road
York Ontario M6M 4R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162422850
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Nov 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farah Jetha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jetha (CPSO#: 113681 )
Business Address: 1286 Weston Rd
York ON M6M 4R3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARAH JETHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JETHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARAH JETHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JETHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2017