THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:44:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mansoura University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Priestman St
Fredericton NB E3B 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5064525225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 13 Dec 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. El-Sherbini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. H. El-Sherbini (CPSO#: 113688 )
Business Address: Suite 601
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 281-9898
Business Address: 800 Priestman Street
Fredericton New Brunswick E3B 0C7
(506) 452-5739

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Mansoura University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Priestman St
Fredericton NB E3B 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5064525225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 13 Dec 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. El-Sherbini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. H. El-Sherbini (CPSO#: 113688 )
Business Address: Suite 601
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 281-9898
Business Address: 800 Priestman Street
Fredericton New Brunswick E3B 0C7
(506) 452-5739

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMDI MOHAMED HAMDI ABDEL-RAHMAN EL-SHERBINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-SHERBINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMDI MOHAMED HAMDI ABDEL-RAHMAN EL-SHERBINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-SHERBINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mansoura University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2017