THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:15:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 46521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MAUVVA VENKATESH REDDY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mauvva Venkatesh Reddy (CPSO#: 113724 )
Business Address: 11 Holimont Crt
Hamilton ON L9C 0B1
438 928 1339

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 46521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MAUVVA VENKATESH REDDY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mauvva Venkatesh Reddy (CPSO#: 113724 )
Business Address: 11 Holimont Crt
Hamilton ON L9C 0B1
438 928 1339

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANTHOSH MAUVVA VENKATESH REDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAUVVA VENKATESH REDDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANTHOSH MAUVVA VENKATESH REDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAUVVA VENKATESH REDDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2017