THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 460 Springbank Drive
Suite 314
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194322568
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 528 Dundas St
Clinic
London ON N6B 1W6
Phone: 5196451533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. U. Akanihu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Akanihu (CPSO#: 113735 )
Business Address: Suite 301B
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 460 Springbank Drive
Suite 314
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194322568
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 528 Dundas St
Clinic
London ON N6B 1W6
Phone: 5196451533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. U. Akanihu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Akanihu (CPSO#: 113735 )
Business Address: Suite 301B
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIDI UCHE AKANIHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKANIHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIDI UCHE AKANIHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKANIHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2017