THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:49:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 144- 1333 Sheppard Ave East
North York
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-491-5900
Fax: 416-491-1149

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MOHAMED AWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Awan (CPSO#: 113736 )
Business Address: 144-1333 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 1V1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 144- 1333 Sheppard Ave East
North York
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-491-5900
Fax: 416-491-1149

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MOHAMED AWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Awan (CPSO#: 113736 )
Business Address: 144-1333 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 1V1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED NAUMAN AWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED NAUMAN AWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2017