THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:58:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hearthstone Clinic Oshawa
111 Simcoe St N
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 316-1715
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5 The Market Pl
East York ON M4C 5M2
Phone: (416) 694-6667
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 - 1501 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1P 4T6
Phone: 416-439-0163
Fax: 416-439-7609

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RAHIM HAJI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Haji (CPSO#: 113761 )
Business Address: 112-50 McIntosh Dr
Markham ON L3R 9T3
Business Address: 100-111 Simcoe St N
New Dawn Medical
Suite A
Oshawa ON L1G 4S4
+1 833-456-3296

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hearthstone Clinic Oshawa
111 Simcoe St N
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 316-1715
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5 The Market Pl
East York ON M4C 5M2
Phone: (416) 694-6667
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 - 1501 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1P 4T6
Phone: 416-439-0163
Fax: 416-439-7609

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RAHIM HAJI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Haji (CPSO#: 113761 )
Business Address: 112-50 McIntosh Dr
Markham ON L3R 9T3
Business Address: 100-111 Simcoe St N
New Dawn Medical
Suite A
Oshawa ON L1G 4S4
+1 833-456-3296

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHIM BASHIR HAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHIM BASHIR HAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2017