THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:04:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Temple University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: True North Imaging
Suite 206
7330 Yonge St.
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 889-5926
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 21 Aug 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Datta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Datta (CPSO#: 113763 )
Business Address: Oxford Medical Imaging
Suite 108
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2J 3Z4
(519) 576-8760
Business Address: 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
Business Address: 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Address: Suite 202
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Temple University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: True North Imaging
Suite 206
7330 Yonge St.
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 889-5926
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 21 Aug 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Datta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Datta (CPSO#: 113763 )
Business Address: Oxford Medical Imaging
Suite 108
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2J 3Z4
(519) 576-8760
Business Address: 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
Business Address: 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Address: Suite 202
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Dec 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 13 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vikas Datta may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vikas Datta may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Temple University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2017