THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:13:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue, M700
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4043
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Y. KIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kim (CPSO#: 113777 )
Business Address: 610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
416 946 4501 Extn: 4043

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue, M700
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4043
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Y. KIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kim (CPSO#: 113777 )
Business Address: 610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
416 946 4501 Extn: 4043

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SO YOUN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SO YOUN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017