THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:38:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Queen's Plate Dr
Etobicoke ON M9W 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-439-6188
Fax: 416-439-6573

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wilson Ventura Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chan (CPSO#: 113778 )
Business Address: 110 Queen's Plate Dr
Etobicoke ON M9W 0B4
4164396188

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Queen's Plate Dr
Etobicoke ON M9W 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-439-6188
Fax: 416-439-6573

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wilson Ventura Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chan (CPSO#: 113778 )
Business Address: 110 Queen's Plate Dr
Etobicoke ON M9W 0B4
4164396188

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILSON VENTURA CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILSON VENTURA CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017