THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:14:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1068 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M8Z 1P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 238-6773
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kentucky

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sofia Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qureshi (CPSO#: 113787 )
Business Address: 1068 The Queensway
Toronto ON M8Z 1P7

Corporation Name: Sofia Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1068 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M8Z 1P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 238-6773
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kentucky

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sofia Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qureshi (CPSO#: 113787 )
Business Address: 1068 The Queensway
Toronto ON M8Z 1P7

Corporation Name: Sofia Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOFIA H QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOFIA H QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2017