THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:58:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1194 Karn Place
Ottawa ON K1H 7Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-521-0999
Fax: 613-521-0444
Address: 705 MacKay St
Pembroke Ontario K1M 2C5
Phone: 613-900-2926
Fax: 613-900-1936
Address: 154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Phone: 613-687-7641
Fax: 613-687-6808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tallaa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tallaa (CPSO#: 113789 )
Business Address: 1194 Karn Place
Ottawa ON K1H 7Z8
613-521-0999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1194 Karn Place
Ottawa ON K1H 7Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-521-0999
Fax: 613-521-0444
Address: 705 MacKay St
Pembroke Ontario K1M 2C5
Phone: 613-900-2926
Fax: 613-900-1936
Address: 154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Phone: 613-687-7641
Fax: 613-687-6808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tallaa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tallaa (CPSO#: 113789 )
Business Address: 1194 Karn Place
Ottawa ON K1H 7Z8
613-521-0999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MESHARI TALLAA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALLAA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MESHARI TALLAA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALLAA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2017