THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:27:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Elm Street
NEOMO Medical
Suite 275
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055863601
Fax: 7055863602
Address: 825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
Phone: 705-869-1420
Fax: No Information Available
Address: health sciences north
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie D. Poulin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Poulin (CPSO#: 113794 )
Business Address: Postgraduate Medical Education
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2C6
(705) 675-4883

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Elm Street
NEOMO Medical
Suite 275
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055863601
Fax: 7055863602
Address: 825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
Phone: 705-869-1420
Fax: No Information Available
Address: health sciences north
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie D. Poulin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Poulin (CPSO#: 113794 )
Business Address: Postgraduate Medical Education
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2C6
(705) 675-4883

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE DANIELLE POULIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POULIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE DANIELLE POULIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POULIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2017