THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:01:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 239-7663
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Health Centre of Maple
2810 Major MacKenzie Dr
Maple Ontario L6A 1R8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. BRYCE BURGER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Burger (CPSO#: 113800 )
Business Address: 300 Rossland Rd E
Ajaz Ontario L1Z 0M1
905-239-7663

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 239-7663
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Health Centre of Maple
2810 Major MacKenzie Dr
Maple Ontario L6A 1R8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. BRYCE BURGER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Burger (CPSO#: 113800 )
Business Address: 300 Rossland Rd E
Ajaz Ontario L1Z 0M1
905-239-7663

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYCE NATHANAEL BURGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYCE NATHANAEL BURGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2017