THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:32:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3771 Spratt Rd
Unit 10
Ottawa ON K1V 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-695-5268
Fax: 613-788-2752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anish Mody Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mody (CPSO#: 113836 )
Business Address: 3771 Spratt Road
Unit 10
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2P3
613 695 5268

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3771 Spratt Rd
Unit 10
Ottawa ON K1V 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-695-5268
Fax: 613-788-2752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anish Mody Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mody (CPSO#: 113836 )
Business Address: 3771 Spratt Road
Unit 10
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2P3
613 695 5268

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANISH MODY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MODY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANISH MODY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MODY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2017