THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:47:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 535 Montreal Rd
Medecine Familiale 535 Family Practice
Ottawa ON K1K 0V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-5350
Fax: (613) 746-5340

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Sivanantharajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sivanantharajah (CPSO#: 113851 )
Business Address: 535 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0V1

Corporation Name: P. Sivanantharajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 May 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 535 Montreal Rd
Medecine Familiale 535 Family Practice
Ottawa ON K1K 0V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-5350
Fax: (613) 746-5340

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Sivanantharajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sivanantharajah (CPSO#: 113851 )
Business Address: 535 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0V1

Corporation Name: P. Sivanantharajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 May 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYANKI SIVANANTHARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVANANTHARAJAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYANKI SIVANANTHARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVANANTHARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2017