THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:38:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-350 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 6J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-4071
Fax: (519) 621-6206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Apr 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SARA HUSSAIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hussain (CPSO#: 113852 )
Business Address: 100-73 Water St N
Cambridge ON N1R 7L6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-350 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 6J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-4071
Fax: (519) 621-6206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Apr 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SARA HUSSAIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hussain (CPSO#: 113852 )
Business Address: 100-73 Water St N
Cambridge ON N1R 7L6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2017