THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11-900 Watters Rd
Orléans ON K4A 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138303837
Fax: 6138301293

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 May 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.N. Maidoh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Maidoh (CPSO#: 113854 )
Business Address: Cumberland Medical Clinic
900 Watters Road
Unit 11
Orléans Ontario K4A 0B4
(613) 830-3837

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11-900 Watters Rd
Orléans ON K4A 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138303837
Fax: 6138301293

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 May 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.N. Maidoh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Maidoh (CPSO#: 113854 )
Business Address: Cumberland Medical Clinic
900 Watters Road
Unit 11
Orléans Ontario K4A 0B4
(613) 830-3837

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIGOZIE NNENNA MAIDOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIDOH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIGOZIE NNENNA MAIDOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIDOH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2017