THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:59:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Barcelona, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CATALAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200-25 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARINA MIR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mir Parramon (CPSO#: 113871 )
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Pediatric Critical Care
HSC 3E20
905-521-2100 Extn: 76651
Business Address: 1200-25 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8P 1H1
4384091339

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CATALAN, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Barcelona, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200-25 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARINA MIR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mir Parramon (CPSO#: 113871 )
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Pediatric Critical Care
HSC 3E20
905-521-2100 Extn: 76651
Business Address: 1200-25 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8P 1H1
4384091339

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jan 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARINA MIR PARRAMON may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Pediatric Critical Care, McMaster University, in which Dr. MIR PARRAMON holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MIR PARRAMON no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MIR PARRAMON’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MIR PARRAMON’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 January, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. MIR PARRAMON's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARINA MIR PARRAMON may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Pediatric Critical Care, McMaster University, in which Dr. MIR PARRAMON holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MIR PARRAMON no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MIR PARRAMON’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MIR PARRAMON’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 January, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. MIR PARRAMON's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Barcelona, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2017