THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:05:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1455 Mayfield Rd
unit A 1
Brampton ON L7A 5G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 365 800 3396
Fax: 905 230 1045

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neeru Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Anand (CPSO#: 113888 )
Business Address: 16-2120 North Port Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 792-0100
Business Address: 1455 Mayfield Rd
unit A 1
Brampton ON L7A 5G6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1455 Mayfield Rd
unit A 1
Brampton ON L7A 5G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 365 800 3396
Fax: 905 230 1045

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neeru Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Anand (CPSO#: 113888 )
Business Address: 16-2120 North Port Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 792-0100
Business Address: 1455 Mayfield Rd
unit A 1
Brampton ON L7A 5G6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEERU ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEERU ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2017