THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:40:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2388 Eglinton Ave East
Scarborough Ontario M1K 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473628786
Fax: 6473628787
Address: 685 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1K 2B8
Phone: 4169070861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 06 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yostina Bichay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Bichay (CPSO#: 113901 )
Business Address: 2388 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1K 2P3
(647) 362-8786

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2388 Eglinton Ave East
Scarborough Ontario M1K 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473628786
Fax: 6473628787
Address: 685 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1K 2B8
Phone: 4169070861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 06 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yostina Bichay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Bichay (CPSO#: 113901 )
Business Address: 2388 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1K 2P3
(647) 362-8786

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Dec 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 13 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Yostina Montasser Bichay may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Yostina Montasser Bichay may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2017