THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1005 King St W
Toronto ON M6K 3M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473606555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients who saw Dr. Dhanji at Union Health, Union Health has stored the medical records with: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. (RSRS)

Email: [email protected]
Phone number: 1-888-563-3732 ext 228
Date Received: 22 Jun 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Soreya Dhanji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dhanji (CPSO#: 113911 )
Business Address: 1-1005 King St W
Toronto ON M6K 3M8
647-360-6555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1005 King St W
Toronto ON M6K 3M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473606555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients who saw Dr. Dhanji at Union Health, Union Health has stored the medical records with: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. (RSRS)

Email: [email protected]
Phone number: 1-888-563-3732 ext 228
Date Received: 22 Jun 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Soreya Dhanji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dhanji (CPSO#: 113911 )
Business Address: 1-1005 King St W
Toronto ON M6K 3M8
647-360-6555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOREYA JEHAN DHANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOREYA JEHAN DHANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2017