THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:36:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical Academy of Silesia, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8990 Chinguacousy Rd
Cornerstone Medical Clinic
Brampton ON L6Y 5X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-450-5780
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8990 Chinguacousy Rd
Cornerstone Medical Clinic
Brampton ON L6Y 5X6
Phone: 905-450-5780
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2404 Eglinton Ave W
Westside Medical Clinic
York ON M6M 1S6
Phone: 416-410-0505
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amar Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel (CPSO#: 113915 )
Business Address: Suite 2
375 Howden Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 4L6
(905) 790-2666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: Medical Academy of Silesia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8990 Chinguacousy Rd
Cornerstone Medical Clinic
Brampton ON L6Y 5X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-450-5780
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8990 Chinguacousy Rd
Cornerstone Medical Clinic
Brampton ON L6Y 5X6
Phone: 905-450-5780
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2404 Eglinton Ave W
Westside Medical Clinic
York ON M6M 1S6
Phone: 416-410-0505
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amar Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel (CPSO#: 113915 )
Business Address: Suite 2
375 Howden Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 4L6
(905) 790-2666

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMAR PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMAR PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical Academy of Silesia, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2017