THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:50:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Wollongong, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle Ann Durst Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Durst (CPSO#: 113974 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Wollongong, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle Ann Durst Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Durst (CPSO#: 113974 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ANN DURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ANN DURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Wollongong, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Apr 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2017