THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:43:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Queensway West- Suite 510
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 -273-4380
Fax: 905-273-4335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria M. Marianchuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Marianchuk (CPSO#: 113977 )
Business Address: 510-89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
905-273-4380

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Queensway West- Suite 510
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 -273-4380
Fax: 905-273-4335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria M. Marianchuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Marianchuk (CPSO#: 113977 )
Business Address: 510-89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
905-273-4380

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA MARIE MARIANCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARIANCHUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA MARIE MARIANCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARIANCHUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2017