THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3075 Hospital Gate
Wellspace MD
#111
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2898150800
Fax: 2892711132
Address: Dundas Neyagawa Medical Centre
Dundas Market Square
479 Dundas St W
Oakville Ontario L6M 1L9
Phone: 905 257 5779
Fax: 855 300 4761
Address: 180 Oak Park Boulevard
Chartwell Oakville Retirement Residence
Oakville Ontario L6H 0A6
Phone: 2896442960
Fax: 9052579791

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Apr 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Zawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zawi (CPSO#: 113978 )
Business Address: 111-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
9056189934
Business Address: 4903 Thomas Alton Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7M 0W8
(905) 336-6102
Business Address: 5B-1015 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 8X3
(905) 636-6886
Business Address: 479 Dundas Street West
Oakville Ontario L6M 1L9
(905) 257-5779

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3075 Hospital Gate
Wellspace MD
#111
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2898150800
Fax: 2892711132
Address: Dundas Neyagawa Medical Centre
Dundas Market Square
479 Dundas St W
Oakville Ontario L6M 1L9
Phone: 905 257 5779
Fax: 855 300 4761
Address: 180 Oak Park Boulevard
Chartwell Oakville Retirement Residence
Oakville Ontario L6H 0A6
Phone: 2896442960
Fax: 9052579791

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Apr 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Zawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zawi (CPSO#: 113978 )
Business Address: 111-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
9056189934
Business Address: 4903 Thomas Alton Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7M 0W8
(905) 336-6102
Business Address: 5B-1015 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 8X3
(905) 636-6886
Business Address: 479 Dundas Street West
Oakville Ontario L6M 1L9
(905) 257-5779

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMI ZAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAWI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMI ZAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAWI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2017